NOTTS TRANS HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of social inclusion and equality and diversity for transgender people in the Nottinghamshire region, who are often socially excluded due to prejudice and historic injustice. This is delivered through provision of support groups, other support events and small targeted grants to those experience financial hardship associated with their circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,707 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Kaye | Chair | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Williams | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mx Margo Amber Rose | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.07k | £3.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262 | £2.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jun 2022 as amended on 17 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR TRANSGENDER PEOPLE IN THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE REGION, WHO ARE OFTEN SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO PREJUDICE AND HISTORIC INJUSTICE, THROUGH: A) PROVISION OF A LOCAL PEER-SUPPORT GROUP, WITH REGULAR IN-PERSON AND ONLINE SUPPORT EVENTS IN ORDER TO ENABLE MEMBERS OF THE TRANSGENDER COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B) INVOLVEMENT IN OTHER EVENTS IN ORDER TO DEVELOP OUR MEMBER'S INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING AND ADVANCING THE CAUSE OF THE LOCAL TRANSGENDER COMMUNITY IN TERMS OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) THE PROVISION OF SMALL, TARGETED GRANTS IN ORDER TO ASSIST MEMBERS EXPERIENCING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "TRANSGENDER" INCLUDES ALL PEOPLE HAVE A GENDER IDENTITY OR GENDER EXPRESSION THAT DIFFERS FROM THE SEX THAT THEY WERE ASSIGNED AT BIRTH. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THIS IS INCLUSIVE OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, TRANSGENDER, NON-BINARY, GENDERFLUID AND GENDER QUESTIONING INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOTTS TRANS HUB
GOTHIC HOUSE
BARKER GATE
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 1JU
- Phone:
- 07398570065
- Email:
- trustees@nottstranshub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window