FRIENDS OF ST ANNE'S HOSPICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING TO MEET THE ANNUAL RUNNING COSTS OF ST.ANNE'S HOSPICE, MALPAS, NEWPORT, GWENT NP20 6ZE. ST.ANNE'S HOSPICE IS THE INPATIENT SPECIALIST PALLIATIVE CARE HOSPICE FOR REISDENTS OF GWENT WHO SUFFER LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS. IT IS OPEN 365 DAYS PER YEAR AND TREATMENT IS FREE ..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 08 March 1988: Standard registration
- 03 June 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 June 2021: Funds transferred to 1010576 ST DAVID'S FOUNDATION HOSPICE CARE
- FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.57k | £236.84k | £116.80k | £78.87k | £54.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.25k | £201.94k | £133.65k | £97.34k | £84.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 08 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | 08 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF ST ANNE'S HOSPICE AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED,INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND,GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION DATED 23 MARCH 1992
Area of benefit
GWENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window