WESPEAK MENTORING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We empower girls in disadvantaged areas globally, by connecting them with professional women who serve as mentors. Through one-on-one guidance, educational workshops, and career advice, the charity helps girls build confidence, set goals, and explore career paths. It fosters a supportive community that encourages personal growth and success, inspiring girls to reach their full potential
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- India
- Pakistan
- United States
Governance
- 20 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aleesha Alam | Chair | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Choudhry | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rimsha Choudhry | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 October 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 October 2024 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG GIRLS FROM COUNTRIES AND COMMUNITIES WHEREBY WOMEN ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED DUE TO THEIR GENDER BY PROVIDING AN ONLINE MENTORING PLATFORM TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
171 BARLOW ROAD
LEVENSHULME
MANCHESTER
M19 3HE
- Phone:
- 07805357760
- Email:
- contact@wespeakgirl.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window