EVERY ONE EATS

Charity number: 1199230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Every One Eats operates a food bank in the Ilkeston area where the food parcels are delivered to people's homes, plus it has a community Christmas Day meal and a Summer event combining live music and food.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,357
Total expenditure: £20,970

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 June 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqui Porter Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Robert Marron Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Adi Elton Trustee 25 December 2021
None on record
Rev Christine French Trustee 05 May 2019
KIRK HALLAM COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Lindsey Rice Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.39k £18.36k
Total expenditure £9.93k £20.97k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.27k
Income from government grants £1.28k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
71 LADYWOOD ROAD
ILKESTON
DE7 4NF
Phone:
01157831793