YOUNG WOMEN INTO FINANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a scholarship programme to support young women from diverse backgrounds to pursue a career in the finance sector to redress the gender imbalance in the finance sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel McCarthy | Chair | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE GOODHIND MBA | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Charles Wilson Spencer | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A FINANCIAL SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAMME OFFERING EDUCATION, MENTORING AND WORK EXPERIENCE OPPORTUNITIES, TARGETING IN PARTICULAR SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN FROM YEAR 12 UPWARDS ATTENDING SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, TO ADDRESS THE UNDERREPRESENTATION OF WOMEN IN THE FINANCE INDUSTRY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O One Search Ltd
29 Queen Annes Gate
London
SW1H 9BU
- Phone:
- 07956902400
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window