THE DAILY BREAD CHRISTIAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Christian charity, that aims to spread the good new of Jesus Christ whilst meeting the basic needs of our client by providing food and clothing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kehinde Bali | Chair | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ibukun Jadesola Kayode | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kehinde Adebajo | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatoyosi Emanuel | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £943 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 February 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING FOOD AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING PRAYER, PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS AND DISCUSSING ITS TEACHINGS AND SIGNPOSTING PEOPLE TO CHRISTIAN CHURCHES IN THEIR LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 STANLEY CLOSE
LONDON
SE9 2BA
- Phone:
- 07974891128
- Email:
- Dailybread.do@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Dailybreadchristian.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window