CLOAKHAM LAWN SPORTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents of Axminster and the surrounding areas, by operating Cloakham Lawn Sports Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £48,708 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 27 July 2022: CIO registration
- 07 August 2023: Funds received from 800076 CLOAKHAM LAWN SPORTS CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon John Flint | Chair | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS RICHARD THOMPSON | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Louise Burn | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harris | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Geoffrey Enticott | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Michelle Jarvis | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Beviss | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ellis | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS AS FOLLOWS: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF AXMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLOAKHAM LAWN SPORTS CENTRE
CHARD ROAD
AXMINSTER
EX13 5HW
- Phone:
- 0129734447
- Email:
- OFFICE@CLOAKHAMLAWN.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window