MAKKI COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in the Islamic faith throughout England and Wales for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Statement of Faith mainly but not exclusively through the holding of services and meetings, religious and supplementary education, maintaining a library of Islamic literature, outreach and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mazhar Khurshid | Chair | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Kathrada | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Ashfaq Cheema | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Idris | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.92k | £43.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.34k | £40.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- 4.1 TO ADVANCE IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF SERVICES AND MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS AND SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION, MAINTAINING A LIBRARY OF ISLAMIC LITERATURE, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE. NOTHING IN THE CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSE WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAKKI MOSQUE
VICTORIA STREET
HECKMONDWIKE
WF16 9LH
- Phone:
- 01924650722
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window