MEOPHAM SPORTS AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dual use sports and leisure facility for use by pupils of the on-site secondary school and for an extensive local community. The facilities include large sports hall, dance studios ,fitness suite and outdoor floodlit courts. Activities on offer include Tennis;Badminton;Martial Arts;Trampoline;Dance Academy ;Gym and Aerobics
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 15 July 2022: CIO registration
- 13 April 2023: Funds received from 293310 MEOPHAM SPORTS AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Sharrod | Chair | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Palmer | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nandita Padki | Trustee | 14 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Morris | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MEOPHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEOPHAM FITNESS & TENNIS CENTRE
THE LEISURE CENTRE
WROTHAM ROAD
MEOPHAM
GRAVESEND
DA13 0AH
- Phone:
- 07909915955
- Email:
- chris.morris@symphony.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window