GAMBLING LIVED EXPERIENCE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GLEN is a GB wide charity working for the relief of those in need directly or indirectly as a result of an addiction to or a misuse of gambling including (but not exclusively) by providing peer support services and the advancement of education by raising public awareness on the nature and issues surrounding gambling, Gambling Related Harms and the misuse of gambling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 September 2022: CIO registration
- GLEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Thomas Walsh | Chair | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dhruv Tomar | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Taylor | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mizanoor Rahman | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Peacock | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.45k | £119.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £87.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY AS A RESULT OF AN ADDICTION TO OR A MISUSE OF GAMBLING INCLUDING (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING PEER SUPPORT SERVICES; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS ON THE NATURE AND ISSUES SURROUNDING GAMBLING, GAMBLING RELATED HARMS AND THE MISUSE OF GAMBLING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07402557855
- Email:
- admin@glenetwork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.