LOWENDER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF CORNWALL, ITS PEOPLE, TRADITIONS, LANGUAGE, SPORTS, ARTS AND SOCIAL AND CULTURAL HISTORY, INCLUDING INTERNATIONAL AND CELTIC CONNECTIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCES AND DEMONSTRATIONS, OUTREACH ACTIVITIES, COURSES, CONCERTS AND AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,324 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Ashley Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Spake | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lamorna Day Dudding | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Katherine Ruth Neale | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Leigh | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mary Tremewan | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN REX DAVEY | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carasek Myghal Davey | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jowdy Lorho-Pasco | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF CORNWALL, ITS PEOPLE, TRADITIONS, LANGUAGE, SPORTS, ARTS AND SOCIAL AND CULTURAL HISTORY, INCLUDING INTERNATIONAL AND CELTIC CONNECTIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCES AND DEMONSTRATIONS, OUTREACH ACTIVITIES, COURSES, CONCERTS AND AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL CIRCUS BUILDINGS
BACK LANE WEST
REDRUTH
TR15 2BT
- Phone:
- 07586080623
- Email:
- hellolowender@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window