VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the Village Hall in good condition. Organising social events in the hall for local people. Maintaining a register of outside organisations using the Hall. Publicising the Availability of the Hall for individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 17 April 1964: Standard registration
- ALLOSTOCK SOCIAL COMMITTEE - ALLOSTOCK SOCIAL GROUP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANDY CLARKE | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
EUNICE DRIFFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON OWENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA ADLINGTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.56k | £5.59k | £2.05k | £31.81k | £10.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.29k | £7.10k | £5.77k | £6.65k | £10.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 26TH APRIL 1958
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
ALLOSTOCK AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Chapel Lane
Allostock
KNUTSFORD
Cheshire
WA16 9ls
- Phone:
- 07774204284
- Email:
- hazelwest1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window