PUMPKIN AND FRIENDS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 2021. Pumpkin and Friends Charity set out to raise awareness and money for animals with disabilities. Providing equipment and financial help. Rescue, rebilhation and rehoming of disabled animals. Therapy dogs, training and certification. Educational visits to schools and universities. Our aim is to open Pumpkin and friends animal retreat and respite centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Marie Squires | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jane Young | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diane Blogg | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Fox | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Blogg | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.09k | £117.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.14k | £91.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DISABLED ANIMALS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, DOMESTIC DOGS, IN NEED OF URGENT CARE AND TREATMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TOWARDS THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER ACCESSORIES TO REGISTERED CHARITIES AND OR COMMUNITY GROUPS; TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE OF DISABLED ANIMALS, ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DISABLED ANIMALS; AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ON THE BENEFITS OF THERAPY DOGS (COMFORT DOGS) AND TO MAKE GRANT TO SUPPORT ANIMAL-ASSISTED THERAPY PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 LISBURN CLOSE
LINCOLN
LN5 8TB
- Phone:
- 07734306407
- Email:
- tamantha2@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window