THE PHOEBE HOSKIN TRUST

Charity Number: 1199081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AMONGST PARENTS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED PRE AND POST LOSS OF A BABY OR INFANT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; A) THE PROVISION OF MEMORY BOXES EITHER THROUGH HOSPITALS, HOSPICES OR DIRECTLY TO THE AFFECTED FAMILIES B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY TO BEREAVED PARENTS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT ACTIVITIES WITH OTHER BEREAVED PARENTS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £1,491
Total expenditure: £376

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jade Hoskin Chair 03 May 2022
None on record
joe howell Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
michael howell Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £3.05k £1.49k
Total expenditure £1.50k £376
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 10 September 2024 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 10 September 2024 222 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 HORSHAM LANE
TAMERTON FOLIOT
PLYMOUTH
PL5 4NP
Phone:
07447024265