Accounts and annual returns TURNBULL FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1199335
Charity reporting is up to date (180 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 November 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 April 2025 180 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 March 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required