SEASCALE RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and manage a recreational facility (a general playing field including cricket pitch) for the benefit of the residents of Seascale and the surrounding areas. The ground is used for the organised playing of cricket and the activities of a local dog training club, in addition the general public have access to the ground at all times for informal recreation including dog excercise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Lee | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Mitchell Franks | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Brown | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Davina Milburn | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John William Pennells | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Holburt | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Willis Moore | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John McElroy | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £817 | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SEASCALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS AND OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FOR LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 CONISTON AVENUE
SEASCALE
CA20 1LW
- Phone:
- 07415059778
- Email:
- andylee615@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window