DEWSBURY MOOR MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 November 2022: Standard registration
- MASJID FAIZAN E MADINA AND MADRESSA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARIQ KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ayaz Hussain | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, IN THE UK, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND COURSES, PRODUCING AND/ OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM, AND ANY OTHER MEANS DEEMED APPROPRIATE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11a Pilgrim Avenue
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF13 3NQ
- Phone:
- 07526538628
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window