Accounts and annual returns LIVING WISDOM WORD MINISTRY MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1199102
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 03 April 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 04 April 2025 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window