MENDAN LIMITED

Charity Number: 1199727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance such charitable purposes in particular but not limited to making grants towards advancing the orthodox Jewish faith, the relief of sickness and preservation of health and the relief of financial hardship and poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £79,585
Total expenditure: £97,673

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 July 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Solomon Mozes Chair 08 March 2022
THE WOODSTOCK MIKVAH LIMITED
Received: On time
BETH SHMUEL SYNAGOGUE LIMITED
Received: On time
Izhak Feder Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Philip Klein Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.18k £79.58k
Total expenditure £85.22k £97.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 8
First Floor
EDGE BUSINESS CENTRE
HUMBER ROAD
LONDON
Phone:
02083719171
Website:

No information available