Financial history CHELFORD PARISH HALL

Charity number: 520030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.09k £25.99k £30.42k £28.47k £40.51k
Total expenditure £25.00k £17.70k £27.19k £27.55k £48.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.37k £13.67k £4.55k £11.00k