WHYTELEAFE COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Whyteleafe Community Hub (WCH) operates in the village of Whyteleafe and was established to benefit all people as part of a sustainable, resilient, and thriving community. It operates a food bank, runs local events, and supports people in the community through service and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 13 September 2022: CIO registration
- WHYTELEAFE & KENLEY COMMUNITY HUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah-Dawn Parker | Chair | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Young | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jones | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Sylvia Ricucci | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian West | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WHYTELEAFE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Whyteleafe Hill
Whyteleafe
Surrey
CR3 0AE
- Phone:
- 07397 078424
- Email:
- office@whyteleafehub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window