ASH GREEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective of the Group is to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society. The main activities of the Group are the provision of the Scouting programme for 6 to 14 year olds in New Ash Green, Kent and the immediate surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 15 June 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Banks | Chair | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Elizabeth Baker | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mollie Louise Burr | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Lewis | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hambleton | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Peter Lewis | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jennings | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gordon Banks | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.77k | £29.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.91k | £44.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 PUNCH CROFT
NEW ASH GREEN
LONGFIELD
Kent
DA3 8HS
- Phone:
- +447795147473
- Email:
- glv@ashgreenscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window