Financial history CHURCH MINSHULL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £8.50k £12.63k £4.47k £7.94k £11.59k
Total expenditure £7.96k £6.37k £5.37k £15.32k £7.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A