Accounts and annual returns THE SOCIETY FOR ARCHAEAL BIOLOGY

Charity number: 1199363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 16 April 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 16 April 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window