Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF GREAT BERRY

Charity number: 1200401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2024 12 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2023 19 April 2024 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2023 19 April 2024 77 days late Download Open in new window