Financial history CREWE UNIT 94 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 520040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.67k £27.95k £14.75k £16.12k £14.31k
Total expenditure £9.71k £21.87k £20.01k £17.42k £13.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £21.00k £2.67k N/A N/A