FELLOWSHIP 345

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Fellowship group promoting the Christian faith amongst the communities of North Ceredigion. We hold a weekly worship service every Sunday at Rhydypennau community hall, Bow street, Ceredigion at 3.45pm. We offer other Christian teaching through bible study groups, prayer meetings and offer prayer ministry at all our services. We welcome people of all denominations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 14 July 2022: CIO registration
- FELLOWSHIP 3.45 (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stuart Rodney Bell | Chair | 03 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Kingston | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Ruff | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Ruff | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Poole | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Jones | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Susan Poole | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prudence Victoria Sarah BELL | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FELLOWSHIP 345 STATEMENT OF BELIEF AND PRACTICE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN NORTH CEREDIGION AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Black Lion Fields
TALYBONT
SY24 5EN
- Phone:
- 01970832346
- Email:
- dtp187@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
fellowship345.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window