DUDDON AND CLOTTON HOOFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings and facilities for sport and general recreation purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £290 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 10 March 1964: Standard registration
- DUDDON CLOTTON AND DISTRICT WAR MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID THOMAS LEADBETTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Catherine Tomlins | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Nicholas | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Ashley Ruffle | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Goulbourne | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Swaffield | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.09k | £23.12k | £15.97k | £9.15k | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.50k | £19.62k | £16.00k | £7.77k | £6.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £19.91k | £10.67k | N/A | £290 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 23 OCTOBER 1947
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF DUDDON AND CLOTTON HOOFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIBURY HEY
BACK LANE
DUDDON
TARPORLEY
CW6 0EZ
- Phone:
- 01829781273
- Email:
- biburyhey@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window