Accounts and annual returns GREAT SUTTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520047
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 03 January 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 30 July 2024 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 February 2023 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 09 August 2022 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required