Financial history GREAT SUTTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520047
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £12.57k £4.00k £10.86k £14.53k £23.70k
Total expenditure £8.14k £7.82k £10.88k £9.48k £25.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A