REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE INITIATIVE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are building a radical and inclusive movement that uplifts the reproductive health and rights of those marginalised and made vulnerable. Through community development and engagement, radical collective care, research, policy and advocacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 2022: CIO registration
- DECOLONISING CONTRACEPTION COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Yosef | Chair | 28 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Tendai Banda | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elsie Sowah | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manna Hamideh Mostaghim | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Okorite Fiona Ephraim | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zuleikha Mohammed | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicia Yeung | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.70k | £40.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.86k | £58.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO PRESERVE, PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AMONG MEMBERS OF BAME COMMUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 3.1.1 DEVELOPING AND DISSEMINATING EVIDENCE-BASED RESOURCES, TOGETHER WITH SIGNPOSTING OTHER INCLUSIVE HEALTH AND SUPPORT SERVICES; 3.1.2 THE PROVISION OF HEALTH-RELATED EDUCATION TO PEOPLE FROM BAME COMMUNITIES AND THE PUBLIC AS A WHOLE BY ADDRESSING HEALTH MISINFORMATION, EDUCATING UNDERREPRESENTED BAME PERSONS ON ISSUES OF HEALTH (IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO THE SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH OF PEOPLE FROM BAME COMMUNITIES) AND EMPOWERING INDIVIDUALS TO BE MORE INFORMED DECISION MAKERS AND TO TAKE BETTER CONTROL OF THEIR HEALTH; 3.2 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 3.2.1 THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF AGE, DISABILITY, SEXUALITY, GENDER, CLASS, CULTURE AND RACE; 3.2.2 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RAISING AWARENESS; 3.2.3 OBTAINING REDRESS FOR VICTIMS OF UNLAWFUL DISCRIMINATION; 3.2.4 PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING ABOUT PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; 3.2.5 CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; 3.2.6 CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 3.3 ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES THAT THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
The Mclaren Building
46 The Priory Queensway
BIRMINGHAM
B4 7LR
- Phone:
- 07783122043
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window