Financial history ELTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 520048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.29k £74.80k £54.08k £42.32k £153.11k
Total expenditure £20.71k £45.22k £30.04k £37.18k £124.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k N/A N/A £1.00k