ELTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Community Centre in the village of Elton, Cheshire, providing local and surrounding areas with a dance hall, stage and surrounding rooms for private parties, dance school, keep fit activities and other social gatherings, all supported by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 19 May 1972: Standard registration
- ELTON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Emmerson | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Price | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Price | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Lunny | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Owens | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Ryan | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline OReilly | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Marks | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Williams | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Leith | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.29k | £74.80k | £54.08k | £42.32k | £153.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.71k | £45.22k | £30.04k | £37.18k | £124.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 20TH JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
A YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ELTON IN THE COUNTY OF CHESTER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ELTON, CHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elton Community Centre
School Lane
Elton
CHESTER
CH2 4PU
- Phone:
- 01928 890849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window