Accounts and annual returns TRUSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1200157
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 February 2025 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 February 2025 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 October 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 February 2025 379 days late Download Open in new window