FRODSHAM YOUTH ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Frodsham Youth Club works with the local community & its young people to provide, host, support, promote, maintain and advance activities that enhance and enrich their development. Access to the building & activities is on a basis of equal opportunity for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £6,000 from government contract(s) and £8,200 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 20 October 1968: Standard registration
- 08 December 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 December 2016: Funds transferred to 1161985 FRODSHAM YOUTH ASSOCIATION
- FRODSHAM AND RAINBOW YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
- FRODSHAM YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.04k | £14.85k | £28.39k | £38.62k | £45.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.73k | £19.02k | £24.20k | £37.14k | £46.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £8.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 27 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 08 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 23 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 24 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 08 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 15TH AUGUST 1968 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES UNDER SECTION 74 (D) DATED 11 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY DEMISED (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE TRUST PROPERTY") SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST AS A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND A YOUTH CLUB FOR THE USE OF A COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIC PARISH OF FRODSHAM (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF HELPING AND EDUCATING GIRLS AND BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FRODSHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window