THE GOOSTREY VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of sports facilities (currently football pitch, bowling green, croquet area, astroturf and pavillion) for the inhabitants of Goostrey and the contigual parishes with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

27 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 03 September 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Clapp | Chair | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Broad | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Richardson | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Jackson | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Gerrard | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Taylor | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wood | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rob Kennerley | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Brigg | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Crouch | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Beckham | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bentham | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Nolan | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Hoghton | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROGER BURGESS | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Seroczynski | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Morris | Trustee | 02 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Lamb | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAGMAR BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN HOWARTH LEAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY ANN BALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR WILLIAM ERNEST ROYCE OLLIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA MARY BRANDRETH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK HURDLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER RUSHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAY ASHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SALLY DYKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79k | £18.41k | £18.36k | £26.10k | £42.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.53k | £25.88k | £12.28k | £24.78k | £69.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD.
Area of benefit
GOOSTREY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 SHEARBROOK LANE
GOOSTREY
CREWE
CW4 8PR
- Phone:
- 01477534160
- Email:
- sally.ball@lineone.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window