THE FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF THE EPILEPSY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of people who have epilepsy and some degree of learning disability and are receiving specialist residential care at the Epilepsy Society, by providing grant funding for activities and facilities directed to improving their quality of life and fitness and to improve the mental health and well-being of care staff
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA DAVIES | Chair | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Knight | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Camp | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Back | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Zahra Jalili | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Davies | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Josephs | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Josephs | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Munday | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Theresa Munday | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.57k | £25.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £10.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE EPILEPSY AND SOME DEGREE OF LEARNING DISABILITY AND ARE RECEIVING SPECIALIST RESIDENTIAL CARE AT THE EPILEPSY SOCIETY, BY PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING FOR ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES DIRECTED TO IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND FITNESS AND TO IMPROVE THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF CARE STAFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 SLICKETTS LANE
EDLESBOROUGH
DUNSTABLE
LU6 2JD
- Phone:
- 07890555391
- Email:
- david@djcomms.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window