GUIDES OVER THE KENT AND LEVEN SANDS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 May 2023: Standard registration
- GUIDE OVER SANDS TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Georgiana Cavendish | Trustee |
|
||||||
Richard Stokes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 April 2025 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 April 2025 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05 APR 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC SERVICES VIA THE PROVISION OF TRAINED AND EXPERIENCED GUIDES (‘SAND PILOTS’) TO CONDUCT MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ACROSS THE KENT AND LEVEN SANDS IN MORECAMBE BAY (‘THE SANDS’) VIA: 2.1.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WALKING ON THE SANDS AND IN THE MORECAMBE BAY AREA, AN INTERNATIONALLY IMPORTANT MARINE ENVIRONMENT AND ONE OF ONLY TWELVE NATURE IMPROVEMENT AREAS IN THE UK; 2.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND SAFETY BY PROVISION OF SAFE PASSAGE FOR THE PUBLIC OVER THE DEEP CHANNELS AND QUICKSANDS OF THE SANDS; 2.1.3 THE PROVISION OF GUIDED WALKS ON THE SANDS FOR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED IN CHARITABLE FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES; 2.1.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE HISTORY OF THE SAND PILOTS AND THE HISTORY OF ROUTES ACROSS THE SANDS; 2.1.5 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE FLORA AND FAUNA AND THE UNIQUE ECOSYSTEMS OF THE SANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLKER SCHOOL HOUSE
CARK IN CARTMEL
GRANGE-OVER-SANDS
LA11 7PQ
- Phone:
- 01539558555
- Email:
- info@guidesoversands.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window