PUDDYDALE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 520062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public Recreation and Childrens Play

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WIRRAL COUNCIL Trustee
OLDERSHAW PRIZE (AT OLDERSHAW SCHOOLS)
Received: On time
J E CAIRNS MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
BIRKENHEAD INSTITUTE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DR MARY THOMPSON PENRICE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE DR MARY THOMPSON PENRICE TRUST FUND (IN CONNEXION WITH WIRRAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS)
Received: On time
OLD MASTERS YOUNG POETS
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 November 2024 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 November 2024 665 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2024 1030 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 November 2024 1395 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WIRRAL BOROUGH COUNCIL
REGENERATION DEPARTMENT
WESTMINSTER HOUSE
HAMILTON STREET
BIRKENHEAD
CH41 5FN
Phone:
01516664701
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available