ST. PAUL'S CHILD CONTACT CENTRE BRACKNELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Pauls Child Contact Centre provides a safe and neutral venue where a child can have contact with the parent or family member with whom the child no longer resides. We open on the 2nd 4th Saturdays of the month at St Pauls United Reformed Church The Square Harmanswater Bracknell Berkshire RG12 9LP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,110 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 03 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Gary Goodburn | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Pamela Joan Day | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diane Perrett | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE ANN WINSTON-BRAY | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Marion Bailey | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SEPARATED FROM PARENTS AND/OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS THROUGH DIVORCE AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN IN BRACKNELL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CHILD CONTACT CENTRE TO FACILITATE CONTACT ARRANGEMENTS WITH NON-RESIDENT PARENTS AND OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS IN A SAFE, SECURE AND NEUTRAL LOCATION. 2. TO ADHERE TO THE STANDARDS SET BY THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILD CONTACT CENTRES AND THE COVENANT WITH ST. PAUL'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
THE SQUARE
BRACKNELL
RG12 9LP
- Phone:
- 07828823367
- Website:
-
bracknellchildcontactcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window