LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MARLOW HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support staff and patients at Marlow Hospital, subject to the overall direction of the Buckinghamshire Primary Care Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 September 2022: CIO registration
- 13 May 2025: Funds received from 1093450 LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MARLOW HOSPITAL
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Land | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Elizabeth Bewley | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Miles Johnson | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE GALVIN | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Heighway | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £24.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE LEAGUE SHALL BE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY GENERALLY SUPPORTING PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS, STAFF AND FORMER STAFF OF MARLOWE HOSPITAL AND ITS PREDECESSORS WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND GENERALLY SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
L G P Solicitors Llp
Lacemaker House
5-7 Chapel Street
Marlow
SL7 3HN
- Phone:
- 01628404626
- Email:
- pland@lgpsolicitors.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window