VILLAGE HALL IRBY

Charity number: 520072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,448
Total expenditure: £17,581

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Gerrard Ireland Chair
ELLESMERE PORT MASONIC HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Norman Scott Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
MRS. CHRIS DUGDALE Trustee
None on record
RAY DUGDALE Trustee
None on record
ALAN BUTTERWORTH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.87k £16.51k £20.67k £15.03k £20.45k
Total expenditure £11.04k £14.98k £21.20k £14.72k £17.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £16.10k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 May 2024 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Irby Village Hall
Thingwall Road
Irby
Wirral
CH61 3UB
Phone:
01516485025
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available