EGERTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Egerton Youth Club is a purpose-built leisure and sports facility that provides facilities for the young people of Knutsford and the surrounding area to meet and take part in sport, leisure and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 26 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RICK DALLIMORE | Chair |
|
||||||
Thomas Joseph O'Donnell | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Naylor | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.76k | £218.21k | £203.81k | £344.87k | £296.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.33k | £222.62k | £214.49k | £254.53k | £300.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £56.57k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 OCTOBER 1964 AND SCHEME OF 27 AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 6TH OF JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 13 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF HELPING AND EDUCATING BOYS AND GIRLS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITY THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
KNUTSFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Egerton Youth Club
Mereheath Lane
KNUTSFORD
WA16 6SL
- Phone:
- 01565 633383
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window