Financial history LACH DENNIS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520074
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.80k £22.10k £36.02k £34.78k £35.10k
Total expenditure £36.10k £14.30k £25.18k £27.70k £27.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.34k N/A N/A N/A