LACH DENNIS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520074

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Lach Dennis Village Hall is a premises held in trust by the earlier mentioned trustees. It is managed by a committee for the benefit of residents of Lach Dennis & surrounding areas. It provides a venue for many activities. E.G. dancing, indoor bowling, bingo. Dog Training, Parish Council meetings, plant society flower shows, bridge, yoga etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £35,098
Total expenditure: £27,166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN HARDMAN Chair
None on record
Josie Bell Trustee 18 February 2020
None on record
JEREMY PLATT Trustee
None on record
PHILLIP WILLIAM RICHARDSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.80k £22.10k £36.02k £34.78k £35.10k
Total expenditure £36.10k £14.30k £25.18k £27.70k £27.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.34k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE FIRS
HOLMES CHAPEL ROAD
LACH DENNIS
NORTHWICH
CW9 7SZ
Phone:
0160641777
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available