PAIGNTON LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1199410

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Paignton Lions club was established in 1971. Part of Lions Clubs International, a voluntary organisation of over 44000 Lions Clubs in 193 countries. Total membership is over 1.4 million members. What are we -We are a non-profit making charity. ALL public donations and funds raised are passed straight to good causes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LIONS CLUB OF PAIGNTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Brian Stone Chair 01 July 2023
None on record
Carol Mary Beasley Trustee 01 July 2023
BRIXHAM LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Alan Philip Tozer Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
MARTIN ALLEN ROGERS Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.87k £0
Total expenditure £6.60k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 VICTORIA PARK ROAD
TORQUAY
TQ1 3QJ
Phone:
03458338754