OXTED PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1199535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide early years education to children aged between 2-4 years helping with their development and preparing them for transition into school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £106,170
Total expenditure: £106,628

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 2022: CIO registration
  • 07 November 2023: Funds received from 1031488 OXTED PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Hawgood Chair 06 January 2025
None on record
Ana Laura Bustos Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record
Lozzie Emma Walker Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record
Matthew Griffiths Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £109.07k £106.17k
Total expenditure £94.34k £106.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants £81.98k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 28 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HALL
21 BLUEHOUSE LANE
OXTED
RH8 0AA
Phone:
07733289486