THE DYLAN STRONG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides support to children diagnosed with cancer and their families and carers and raises public awareness in matters relating to childhood cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Baker | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Stirling-Aird | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Louise Wright | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Clark | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huw Davies-Evans | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.94k | £63.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.30k | £74.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO CHILDREN WITH CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, AND (2) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN MATTERS RELATING TO CHILDHOOD CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20A OATFIELD ROAD
TADWORTH
KT20 5EP
- Phone:
- 07824826998
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window