EXAM STAR LEARNER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To deliver both school and parent facing educational tutorials to help improve students' attainments as well as parental engagement in children's education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 October 2022: CIO registration
- EXAM STAR? (Working name)
- EXAM STAR LEARNER COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CEBASTIN GNAHORE | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES SEANLA | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GOUETEY MANOU RITA TOGBA | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £835 | £745 | |
|
Total expenditure | £665 | £702 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 5-18 WITH A FOCUS ON SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE OR LOW COST EDUCATIONAL ONLINE TUTORIALS IN ENGLISH, MATHS, SCIENCE AND FRENCH, INCLUDING SUPPORT FOR GCSE AND A LEVEL EXAM PREPARATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Swanley House
Kinglake Estate
LONDON
SE17 2LF
- Phone:
- 02039076858
- Email:
- info@examstar.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window