FLETCHERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1199774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fletchers Foundation has been created by the Fletchers Group, a trading name of Fletchers Solicitors, to help individuals, their families and partner with community groups and charities to help individuals thrive after a serious injury, accident, or illness. Operating across the U.K., we support individuals via grants for aid, equipment and therapies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £94,173
Total expenditure: £69,821

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 July 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Irene Afful Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Adrian Kevin Denson Trustee 31 May 2022
MTPSS NORTH LIMITED
Recently registered
PAUL LAURENCE MAY Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record
Richard Cullen Fraser Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £26.64k £94.17k
Total expenditure £9.88k £69.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 03 May 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 03 May 2024 64 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 Hoghton Street
Southport
PR9 0PU
Phone:
03300 081212